U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vallelunga
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Judgment - Amended]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Evaluation]
  • December 16, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 30, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 05, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.