U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Royer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 31, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 07, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 07, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 07, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 19, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2020: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • February 25, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2020: [Brief]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 11, 2019: [Response]
  • July 10, 2019: [Response]
  • July 10, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • July 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 05, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 05, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • April 23, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Request]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2018: [Arrest]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.