U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40458
  • Case Name: Timothy Gerhard Arntz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
October, 2018
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.