U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-04120
  • Case Name: Maxfield v. Vanderaa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Declaration]
  • February 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Supplement]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Response]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 02, 2019: [Extend]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 04, 2019: [Letter Sent]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Letter Received]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2019: [Letter Received]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Supplement]
  • February 28, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • February 05, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 04, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 16, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 11, 2019: [Letter Received]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 13, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 03, 2018: [Letter Received]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Supplement]
  • November 02, 2018: [Letter Received]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 15, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • September 21, 2018: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.