U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hammer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 13, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 13, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Extend]
  • April 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • February 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 22, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 14, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 14, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Request]
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 24, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.