U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greening
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 16, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 07, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 07, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 06, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2021: [Consent]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 15, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 27, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 21, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • September 26, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 25, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 25, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 25, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.