U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30120-3
  • Case Name: USA v. St. Cloud et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • July 10, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 22, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • May 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 07, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 26, 2019: [Furlough]
  • April 10, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 05, 2019: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 20, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2018: [Request]
  • December 11, 2018: [Request]
  • December 04, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 05, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 03, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2018: [Request]
  • September 26, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 25, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 25, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.