U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrada
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Supplement]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 11, 2019: [Certificate]
  • December 06, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Furlough]
  • October 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 25, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 23, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Suppress]
  • August 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 13, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 08, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 26, 2019: [Furlough]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2019: [Response]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 31, 2018: [Furlough]
  • October 29, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • October 15, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 05, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [Request]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.