U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-05005
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. Rapid City Fire Department
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2018
  • December 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • December 07, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 07, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Admission of Service]
  • November 01, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Additional Summons Issued]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • September 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.