U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30047
  • Case Name: James Gallegos and Alyssa Gallegos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.