U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tallman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 09, 2024: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 16, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 13, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 11, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.