U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40484
  • Case Name: Joseph Michael Redder
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • September 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • September 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (text entry only)]
  • August 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • September 20, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • April 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
March, 2020
  • March 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
February, 2020
  • February 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Professional]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • August 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor Report of Sale (Ch 11, 12 or 13)]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • August 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service Pursuant to LBR 9072-1(b) of Proposed Order]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1) and (d)]
  • November 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.