U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50223
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Doyle Ofstad
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2019
  • February 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • January 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.