U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mackaben
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • December 07, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 22, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 22, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 09, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 09, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.