U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richardson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • April 05, 2021: [Return of Property]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Appeal Record Returned]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Mail Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Response]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 09, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • September 03, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 03, 2020: [USCA Opinion]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 15, 2020: [Forfeiture]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 24, 2019: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 10, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 10, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 09, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 09, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 18, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 06, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • June 03, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 31, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 31, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 07, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Text Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 20, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 19, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 15, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 10, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.