U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 25, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 25, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 07, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Request]
  • October 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.