U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10101
  • Case Name: Kimberly Ellen Boswell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • January 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.