U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gengler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • March 11, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 07, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • December 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 06, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 30, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 25, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.