U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arevalos-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2019: [Arrest]
  • April 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • April 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • March 21, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 14, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 05, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.