U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramirez-Sandoval
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 06, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 22, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2018: [Response]
  • October 15, 2018: [Request]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.