U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Siecke et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 07, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 12, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • June 08, 2021: [Response]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extend]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 25, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 04, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 04, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • April 26, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 05, 2021: [Extend]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Response]
  • October 07, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 30, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 15, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 09, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 19, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 14, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 13, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 12, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 10, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 02, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 17, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 09, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 05, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 12, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 11, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 30, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Continuance Order - 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 03, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 24, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 22, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 04, 2019: [Discovery]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 28, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 28, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • February 26, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 25, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Response]
  • February 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 20, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 19, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 15, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 14, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2019: [Arrest]
  • February 12, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 12, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • February 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 12, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 11, 2019: [Discovery]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • January 28, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 24, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 22, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 22, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2019: [Arrest]
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 14, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 14, 2019: [Revoke]
  • January 14, 2019: [Hearing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 07, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 08, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 08, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 29, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2018: [Response]
  • October 23, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 10, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.