U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10103
  • Case Name: Jason Lee Wagner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder to File a Document]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Vacating Order]
  • December 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.