U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MacDonald-Fisher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 15, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 08, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 03, 2020: [Restitution Related Document (attorney use)]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 30, 2020: [Receipt]
  • November 30, 2020: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 07, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 12, 2019: [Furlough]
  • December 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 08, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 25, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Request]
  • November 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 11, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.