U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hammer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 11, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 11, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 03, 2019: [Forfeiture]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 21, 2018: [Discovery]
  • November 05, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 30, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 17, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 11, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.