U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brink
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • February 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 19, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • February 19, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 29, 2018: [Discovery]
  • October 26, 2018: [Response]
  • October 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 25, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 23, 2018: [Request]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 12, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.