U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Voorhees
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 04, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 15, 2019: [Reconsideration]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2018: [Consent]
  • December 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 02, 2018: [Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Response]
  • October 18, 2018: [Request]
  • October 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.