U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 21, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 02, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 08, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 08, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 11, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 04, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 01, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2020: [Evaluation]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 08, 2019: [Consent]
  • November 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 17, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 15, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Objection]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 06, 2019: [Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • August 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 15, 2018: [Request]
  • October 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 12, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.