U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-05006
  • Case Name: Giago v. Black Hills Federal Credit Union
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • November 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • November 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • November 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Admission of Service]
  • October 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.