U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10105
  • Case Name: Alexander John Thorson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • August 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.