U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10107
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Alan Pike
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
November, 2021
  • November 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • October 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.