U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40498
  • Case Name: Erin Mayann Hegg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
April, 2019
  • April 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement (Includes signature of Debtor's attorney)]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.