U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-04133
  • Case Name: Simpson v. Kaemingk et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Mail Returned]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Letter Sent]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Letter Sent]
  • October 16, 2018: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 16, 2018: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 16, 2018: [Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.