U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 29, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 22, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 01, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 26, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 02, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 14, 2019: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 18, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 18, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 18, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 16, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 15, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 15, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 14, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 14, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: [Brief]
  • January 10, 2019: [Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2018: [Request]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.