U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 27, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 06, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 06, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 06, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 24, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 02, 2019: [Furlough]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 31, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 29, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 12, 2019: [Brief]
  • July 12, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 12, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2019: [Brief]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 12, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Brief]
  • January 29, 2019: [Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Request]
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 20, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 19, 2018: [Request]
  • December 19, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.