U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 08, 2020: [Response]
  • June 08, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 04, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 01, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 01, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 29, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • May 29, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 13, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 06, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • February 06, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 13, 2019: [Forfeiture]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 29, 2019: [Oral Order for Self Surrender]
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2018: [Request]
  • October 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 22, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 22, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 22, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 22, 2018: [Request]
  • October 19, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 19, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 19, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.