U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Long
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 18, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 17, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 26, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 21, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Request]
  • May 16, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2019: [Request]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arrest]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.