U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 31, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 26, 2018: [Response]
  • December 21, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 12, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 11, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 11, 2018: [Suppress]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • November 26, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 26, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 21, 2018: [Request]
  • November 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 29, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.