U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roubideaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report/Evaluation Received]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 31, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 31, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 26, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 26, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 23, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • October 21, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 20, 2020: [Request]
  • October 19, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • October 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2020: [Request]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2020: [Indictment]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 23, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 27, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 27, 2019: [Extend]
  • March 21, 2019: [In Limine]
  • March 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 24, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 24, 2019: [Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 04, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Request]
  • November 29, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 28, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 27, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 27, 2018: [Request]
  • November 27, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 16, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.