U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Battese
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 09, 2022: [Furlough]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 12, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 03, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • February 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 01, 2019: [Furlough]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 17, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 16, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • July 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 09, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • July 08, 2019: [Jury List]
  • July 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 15, 2019: [Reply]
  • April 15, 2019: [Furlough]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2019: [Continue]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 23, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • October 23, 2018: [Request]
  • October 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2018: [Request]
  • October 22, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.