U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodlow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 16, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 02, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 28, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 15, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 04, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 15, 2020: [Furlough]
  • January 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • November 07, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 07, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 13, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 03, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 08, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 07, 2019: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 28, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 28, 2018: [Arrest]
  • December 28, 2018: [Request]
  • December 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 28, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • December 27, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.