U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tysver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 17, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • July 19, 2019: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • July 19, 2019: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • July 19, 2019: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • July 16, 2019: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 10, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 26, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 25, 2018: [Request]
  • October 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • October 24, 2018: [Request]
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.