U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Menard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 23, 2022: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • September 23, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 23, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extend]
  • September 02, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 24, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 20, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 06, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2021: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 18, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 08, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 22, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 22, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 13, 2021: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • January 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 07, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 19, 2019: [Consent]
  • June 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 07, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 18, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 18, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 18, 2019: [Request]
  • January 17, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • January 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Request]
  • January 16, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 02, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 17, 2018: [Indictment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.