U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Renville
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extend]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Memorandum Letter]
  • July 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 01, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • May 12, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 26, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 03, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Response]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 20, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 16, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 13, 2019: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 11, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 10, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • September 06, 2019: [Memorandum Letter]
  • September 06, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 06, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 09, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • April 22, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 17, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 17, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2019: [Consent]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 05, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 18, 2018: [Arrest]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.