U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tyon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • August 09, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • May 16, 2022: [Response]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extend]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Supplement]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission]
  • April 12, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • April 11, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • April 11, 2022: [Admission]
  • April 04, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 26, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 26, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • March 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2020: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • January 29, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 03, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • January 03, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 08, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 02, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Consent]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 04, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 22, 2019: [Suppress]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 14, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 14, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2019: [Declaration]
  • January 10, 2019: [Extend]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 14, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 23, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 23, 2018: [Request]
  • October 22, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 18, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.