U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40508
  • Case Name: Rae Lynn Marie Amundson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Late Notice]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.