U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50234
  • Case Name: Kristin Marie Bercier and Chase Brandon Bercier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
December, 2018
  • December 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Returned Mail]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.