U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50233
  • Case Name: John Anthony Kranz and Barbee Garlean Kranz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Report of Sale]
  • January 22, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order (no notice required)]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Compensation]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reminder to File a Document]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amend Order (no notice required)]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Administrative Expense]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional (text order)]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Supplement]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional (text order)]
  • October 10, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Professional]
  • October 08, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 07, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Motion (prior Court approval required)]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement re: Death/Incompetency of Debtor]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Supplement]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
February, 2021
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver of notice) (fee required)]
November, 2020
  • November 14, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 12, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 03, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 10, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief From Automatic Stay]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.