U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50232
  • Case Name: David Matthew Pelletier and Jana Lyn Pelletier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Re: Approval/Denial of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.