U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-05007
  • Case Name: First National Bank North Platte v. Bergeson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismissing Adversary Proceeding]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Hearing/Deadlines/Trial]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 29, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Objection]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • October 19, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 19, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.