U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40511
  • Case Name: Jane Lynette Kathryn Estrada
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Affidavit]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Amendment]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Intention]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule C]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule J]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule I]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule H]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule G]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule E/F]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule D]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Schedule A/B]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.